CNET Networks, Inc. v. Etilize, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv05378
Filed: August 31, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2009 376 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED INJUNCTION AND ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; Each side to bear costs; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/14/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
January 23, 2009 351 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending pretrial filing deadlines to 1/272/009; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/23/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 8, 2009 336 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 1/12/2009 for filing of oppositions to motions in limine; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/7/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 7, 2009 335 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: For the foregoing reasons, the court HEREBY ORDERS that:(1)Etilize's motion for leave to amend its invalidity contentions under Patent Local Rule 3-7 is DENIED. (2)CBSI's motion to strike E tilize's final invalidity contentions is also DENIED. (3)CBSI's motion to modify the protective order is GRANTED. The protective order entered by this court on October 16, 2007 will be modified by the stipulation the parties presented to the court at the December 4, 2008 oral argument. The parties will file the stipulation as an addendum to the protective order. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
October 22, 2008 222 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 140 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 143 defendant's Motion to Amend/Correct (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
September 25, 2008 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING proposed 192 Stipulation accelerating hearing date; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/25/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 2, 2008 188 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: defendants motion on noninfringement is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; plaintiffs motions to strike are DENIED; defendants motion to bifurcate is DENIED; and defendants motion to file a supplemental brief is DENIED(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNET Networks, Inc. v. Etilize, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?