Champagne et al v. The City and County of San Francisco et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05425
Filed: September 1, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 145 MOTION FOR ORDER TO SET ASIDE ORDER AND ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 30, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
October 15, 2008 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White REJECTING Recommendation and GRANTING 78 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 22, 2008 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/22/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
February 8, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND ALL FURTHER DISCOVERY TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE 42 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Parties' Joint Letter Brief Concnering Discovery Issues filed by Gary A. Champagne. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champagne et al v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?