Cuviello et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Joseph P. Cuviello and Deniz Bolbol
Defendant: City Of Oakland, Alameda County, Oakland-Alameda County Coliseum Authority, Oakland Coliseum Joint Venture, L.L.C., SMG, Oakland Police Officer R. Villegas, Oakland Coliseum Assistant Security Manager "Skeet" Ellis, Oakland Police Officer R. Valladon (7194P) and Robert Valladon
3rd_party_defendant: All Defendants
Case Number: 3:2006cv05517
Filed: January 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 533 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 532 re Stipulated Permanent Injunction filed by Deniz Bolbol. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 505 Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER Denying 485 Intervenor's Motion to Modify Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/1/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER re 519 Joint Discovery Letter of October 22, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER re August 7, 2012 Video. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 496 STIPULATION AND ORDER - motion reset from 10/5/12 to 10/26/12 at 1:30 p.m. opp due 9/25/12. Reply due 10/2/12.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Re 482 Joint Letter of August 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/6/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER Re Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for 471 Plaintiffs' Request for Administrative Relief. Defendants and/or Feld shall file Response by 7/25/2012. Plantiffs shall file Reply by 7/27/2012 at 12:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/18/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND SETTING CMC FOR 8/10/12 AT 10:30 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/9/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER RE 2/23/12 DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 448 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MEET AND CONFER re Set/Reset Hearings, Set/Reset Deadlines Discovery Meet and Confer is reset for 2/21/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER re (440 in 3:06-cv-05517-EMC) Letter filed by Joseph P. Cuviello Meet and confer set for 2/2/12 at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Attorney Jon Mark Thacker withdrawn; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/19/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part 320 defendants' Motion for modification of Preliminary Injunction (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Feld Entertainment's motion to intervene is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion to modify the preliminary injunction is DENIED; the ten-foot buffer zone restriction applies to all parties, including Feld Entertainment. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is DENIED because civil penalties under California Civil Code section 52(b)(2) are unavailable for a Section 52.1 violation. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel; See order for more details (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying defendant's Motion to Stay proceeding as moot. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER scheduling evidentiary hearing for 87 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause re Contempt and Sanctions. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/2009. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 159 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order to Modify Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs shall have until 12:00 p.m., February 20, 2009, to file a response to the SMG Defendants' motion for summary judgment. The response to the City Defendants' motion remains due today. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 131 135 Defendants' Ex Parte Applications to Modify Court Scheduling Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Status Conference to 10/6/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/19/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuviello et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P. Cuviello
Represented By: Gilbert Whitney Leigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deniz Bolbol
Represented By: Matt Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland-Alameda County Coliseum Authority
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Coliseum Joint Venture, L.L.C.
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMG
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Police Officer R. Villegas
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Coliseum Assistant Security Manager "Skeet" Ellis
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Police Officer R. Valladon (7194P)
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Valladon
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: All Defendants
Represented By: Edward D. Baldwin, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?