United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company et al v. Nurisso et al

Plaintiff: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company and St. Paul Medical Liability Insurance Company
Defendant: Robert Nurisso, Virginia Nurisso, Wild Horse, LP, Joseph Anthony Guglielmo, Ardis M. Guglielmo and Guggs Investments, LP
Miscellaneous: David M. Wiseblood
Case Number: 3:2006cv05590
Filed: September 12, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/11. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
March 10, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING FURTHER HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SELL re 98 Stipulation, filed by St. Paul Medical Liability Insurance Company, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
February 1, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING HEARING FROM 2/23/11 TO 3/23/11 re 96 Stipulation, filed by St. Paul Medical Liability Insurance Company, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 11, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 83 MOTION for Order to sell securities to partially satisfy Plaintiff's judgment against Guglielmo. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company et al v. Nurisso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Represented By: David Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: David Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: David Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Medical Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: David Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nurisso
Represented By: James M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Nurisso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Horse, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Anthony Guglielmo
Represented By: James M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardis M. Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guggs Investments, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: David M. Wiseblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?