Mowdy et al v. Beneto Bulk Transport et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05682
Filed: September 15, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2012 248 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 246 Notice (Other), filed by Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., Joaquan Harvey, Ron Mowdy, Beneto Bulk Transport. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
October 5, 2011 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 215 Issues for October 21, 2011 Hearing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 16, 2011 219 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 91/6/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
May 20, 2011 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STATISTICALLY CLOSING ACTION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/20/2011.(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
September 30, 2010 199 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (with changes) re 198 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., Beneto Bulk Transport. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 09/30/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
July 27, 2010 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Attorneys Charles F. Barker for defendants Beneto Bulk Transport, Kenan Advantage Group, Inc. added; Attorneys Jill Ann Porcaro, Michael A. Curley and Jennifer Ann Lockhart withdrawn; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/27/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mowdy et al v. Beneto Bulk Transport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?