United States Of America v. $152,460.15 In Funds From Wells Fargo Account Number 031-1834949

Case Number: 3:2006cv05759
Filed: September 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulated Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 3, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Further Status Report Status Report due by 4/10/2009 and every 120 days thereafter.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/3/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
September 20, 2006 2 Opinion or Order of the Court Civil Standing ORDER. CMC on 2/23/07 at 1:30 pm. Signed by Jeffrey S. White. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. $152,460.15 In Funds From Wells Fargo Account Number 031-1834949
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?