Wren et al v. RGIS Inventory Specialists

Case Number: 3:2006cv05778
Filed: September 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2012 949 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/21/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
June 20, 2011 942 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 941 Stipulation re: Distribution of Settlement Funds filed by Trisha Wren. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/20/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 13, 2011 940 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re 909 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Trisha Wren, Brent Whitman, Kevin Barnes, Cynthia Piper. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 13, 2011 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011).
April 1, 2011 932 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero re MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT [Docket No. 912];(2) PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES [Docket No. 909]; AND (3) PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SERVICE AWARDS. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
February 28, 2011 921 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND SERVICE AWARDS. Plaintiff has until 3/14/11 to file the unfiled objections, supplemental attorney delcarations, and named Plaintiff and class rep. decs. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 17, 2011 919 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING MAILING OF NOTICE OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT TO ADDITIONAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/17/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
January 14, 2011 908 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FURTHER MAILING OF NOTICE OF PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/14/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 3, 2011 903 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISPENSING WITH HEARING ON PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO CONVERT JANUARY 28, 2011 FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL HEARING TO HEARING FOR TENTATIVE FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND FOR APPROVAL OF MODIFIED FORMS OF NOTICE OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 01/03/2011. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 7, 2010 883 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ALTERNATIVE FORMS OF NOTICE OF CLASS SETTLEMENT TO SELECT GROUPS OF INDIVIDUALS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/07/10. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 2, 2010 864 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES, AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SERVICE AWARDS FOR THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES. Date extended to 12/3/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/02/10. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
August 9, 2010 844 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re 843 Stipulation filed by RGIS Inventory Specialists. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/6/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 839 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXTENSION OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Trisha Wren, Cynthia Piper. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 6, 2010. (fritze, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 17, 2010 837 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. 833 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT specially set for 7/29/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/17/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
April 30, 2010 832 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT MEDIATION REPORT AND STIPULATION AND ORDER RE REVISED CASE MANAGEMETN AND PRETRIAL ORDER. 810 MOTION to Certify Class DECERTIFY California Labor Code Section 226 Claim hearing reset to 6/25/10 at 9:30 AM. Further Case Management Confer ence reset for 6/25/2010 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference specially set for 7/29/2010 at 9:30 AM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/30/10. **NOTE: Please see date changes on pages 3 and 4.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
February 11, 2010 809 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Second Case Management Conference and Trial Planning re-set for 4/2/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/11/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
November 2, 2009 788 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re: Trial Planning re-set for 11/13/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/2/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 27, 2009 785 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING DATE AND SUBMISSION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT REGARDING TRIAL PLAN PER COURT'S OCTOBER 20, 2009 ORDER. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 11/6/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Joint submission due by 11/4/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/27/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 20, 2009 782 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER IN PERSON AND FILE AMENDED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT REGARDING TRIAL PLAN. Case Management Conference reset to 10/30/2009 at 1:30 P.M. before the Honorable Joseph C. Spero, Courtroom A, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave., San Francisco, CA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/20/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 8, 2009 779 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 778 Letter filed by Trisha Wren, Kevin Barnes, Cynthia Piper to file proposed trial plans on 10/14/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/8/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
August 24, 2009 775 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part (648) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:06-cv-05778-JCS (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
July 8, 2009 758 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Rule 23 Notice. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 8, 2009. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
June 19, 2009 746 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 19, 2009. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 17, 2009 743 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADDRESSING RULE 23 NOTICE DISPUTES [Docket No. 731] AND SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION [Docket No. 648]. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 17, 2009. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
May 29, 2009 740 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Docket #732 in 3:06-cv-05778-JCS (Joint Proposal regarding Opt-in Plaintiffs). Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 29, 2009. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
April 3, 2009 721 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 720 Notice (Other) filed by Trisha Wren, Brent Whitman, Kevin Barnes, Cynthia Piper of Closure of the Sacramento Officeof Bailey Pinney, PC and Withdrawal of Attorney MacFarlane as Plaintiffs' Counsel. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/3/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 23, 2009 715 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SEEKING CONTINUANCE FOR SUBMISSION OF PLAINTIFFS' LIST OF OPT-INS AND PARTIES' JOINT PROPOSAL. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/23/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 700 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SEEKING ONE-WEEK CONTINUANCE FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN, PER COURT'S FEBRUARY 6, 2009 ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/23/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 6, 2009 694 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DEFENDANT REGIS LLC'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION; PLATIFFS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE ISSUES AT TRIAL; DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS INVALID OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS AND RELATED M OTIONS TO STRIKE. Rule 23 Motion [docket no. 403] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion to Decertify [docket no. 569] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion to Bifurcate [docket no. 413] and the Motion to Dismiss [docket no. 586] are DENIED without prejudice. The Motion to Strike [docket nos. 528, 481, 570, 614 and 664] are DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/06/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 5, 2009 687 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS GOVERNING RGIS LLC'S REPLY MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/5/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 9, 2008 668 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTUINUING DECMEBER 19, 2008 HEARING DATE. Reset hearing Deadlines as to 664 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Evidence, 569 MOTION to Certify Class, 413 MOTION to Bifurcate Notice of Motion and Motion to Bifurc ate Issues at Trial: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Bifurcate Issues at Trial, 481 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendant's Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37< /I>, 614 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37, 648 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial), 570 MOTION to Strike 539 Reply to Response to Motion, 543 Affidavit, 453 Declarat ion in Support, 451 Memorandum in Opposition MOTION to Strike 539 Reply to Response to Motion, 543 Affidavit, 453 Declaration in Support, 451 Memorandum in Opposition, 528 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Points an d Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, 586 MOTION to Dismiss Invalid Opt-In Plaintiffs, 403 MOTION to Certify Class. Pending Motion Hearing continued to * 1/9/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/09/08. *Please note date change.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
November 21, 2008 638 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS GOVERNING RGIS, LLC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/20/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 18, 2008 621 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS GOVERNING RGIS LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DECERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/18/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 7, 2008 612 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 608 Stipulation Re Page Limitations For Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Decertify Collective Action filed by Trisha Wren, Brent Whitman, Kevin Barnes, Cynthia Piper. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/7/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 5, 2008 600 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Resetting Hearing on Rule 23 Class Certification Motion and Related Motions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 5, 2008. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 4, 2008 599 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 598 Stipulation Re Page Limitations for Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Decertify Collective Action And Defendant's Repy Regarding Same, filed by Trisha Wren, Brent Whitman, Kevin Barnes, Cynthia Piper. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/4/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 22, 2008 576 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Setting Deadlines. Deadline for filing summary judgment motions by 11/21/08. Deadline for filing opposition papers to summary judgment motions by 12/12/08. Deadline for filing reply papers to summary judgment motions by 12/30/08. Hearing on motions for summary judgments shall be 2/6/09 at 9:30 a.m. The Final Pre-Trial Conference shall be held on March 20, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. Trial set for 4/13/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/21/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 15, 2008 573 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 572 Stipulation Re Deposition of Dr. Slottje filed by Trisha Wren, Brent Whitman, Kevin Barnes, Cynthia Piper. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/15/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 1, 2008 557 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (556 in 3:06-cv-05778-JCS) Stipulation Re Personnel Files filed by Trisha Wren, Kevin Barnes, Cynthia Piper. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/1/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 18, 2008 538 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Quash re ( 536 in 3:06-cv-05778-JCS) Letter filed by RGIS Inventory Specialists. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/18/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 15, 2008 534 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 533 Stipulation To Allow Filing of Respective Expert Reports On FLSA Matters To Occur Concurrently With Decertification Briefing Schedule, filed by RGIS Inventory Specialists. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/15/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 4, 2008 522 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE For Failing To Respond To Court-Ordered Discovery Show Cause Response due by 10/4/2008.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/4/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 3, 2008 515 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re BRIEFING AND HEARING DATES FOR RULE 23 CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION, MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION FOR DECERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 3, 2008. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wren et al v. RGIS Inventory Specialists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?