Lelaind v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv05870
Filed: September 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2008 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (NINETY-DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/9/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 15, 2008 98 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice and ORDER of Further Settlement Conference. Updated Confidential Settlement Conference Statement due 10/1/2008.Further Settlement Conference set for 10/8/2008 09:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/15/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 2, 2008 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) motion for continuance is denied. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lelaind v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?