Contreras v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Number: 3:2006cv06017
Filed: September 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
February 11, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re 18 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Rosemary Contreras. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/11/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
January 27, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF; ORDER CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?