Abbott et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Case Number: 3:2006cv06074
Filed: September 28, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles Breyer on 4/5/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Mellissa Ann Udstrand terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/26/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 42 Stipulation filed by Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer Inc., G.D. Searle LLC, John M. Drake terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/30/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re (33 in 3:06-cv-06074-CRB) Stipulation filed by Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer Inc., G.D. Searle LLC, Cherie Hodshire terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/6/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice re (29 in 3:06-cv-06074-CRB) Stipulation filed by Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer Inc., G.D. Searle LLC, Roberta A. Phares terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 107/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?