Davis v. Barnhart et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06108
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Welfare
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2012 364 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re (and #277 in 3:09-cv-00980-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation For Compromise Settlement and Releases; [Proposed] Order filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 8, 2012 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING Joint Discovery Plan [352 in 3:06-cv-06108-EMC], [264 in 3:09-cv-00980-EMC]. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 06/08/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
May 15, 2012 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (337 in 3:06-cv-06108-EMC) Requesting Additional Briefing; Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/15/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
April 30, 2012 338 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES re (336 in 3:06-cv-06108-EMC) Proposed Order filed by Michael J. Astrue, (247 in 3:09-cv-00980-EMC) Proposed Order filed by Michael J. Astrue Discovery due by 6/22/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
March 26, 2012 334 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re (242 in 3:09-cv-00980-EMC) STIPULATION RE Time for Plaintiffs to have until 9/4/12 to file objection to Judge Cousins' March 15 2012 recommendation filed by John Doe 1. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 22, 2012 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Disputed Privilege Log Entry No. 4 (325, 331 in 3:06-cv-06108-EMC) (235, 241 in 3:09-cv-00980-EMC). Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 03/22/12. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 19, 2012 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (325 in 3:06-cv-06108-EMC) (235 in 3:09-cv-00980-EMC) Statement re Disputed Privilege Log Entry. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 03/19/12. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 15, 2012 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Discovery Dispute [209 in 3:09-cv-00980-EMC], [219 in 3:09-cv-00980-EMC]. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 03/15/12. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 2, 2012 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 295 Proposed Order filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 1, 2012 291 Opinion or Order of the Court DISREGARD ENTRY -- THIS ENTRY INCORRECTLY FILED IN C-06-6108 INSTEAD OF C-09-0980. ORDER Re 193 Joint Statement Re Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/1/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (emcsec, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 284 Motion to Change Times In Notice of Referral And Setting Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 02/29/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 13, 2012 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 195 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 1, 2012 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Hearing on February 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 17, 2012 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiffs' Letter of January 12, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/17/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 11, 2012 258 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL CMC STATEMENT TO BE FILED BY 1/30/12 re (169 in 3:09-cv-00980-EMC) Stipulation filed by John Doe 1. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
August 18, 2011 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 230 Defendant's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 16, 2011 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 211 Defendant's Motion to Stay. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
April 12, 2011 225 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING LITIGATION pending further settlement conference; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/11/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
March 31, 2011 220 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REMOVE DOCUMENTS (204 in 3:06-cv-06108-MHP) Declaration in Support filed by Michael J. Astrue, AND (118 in 3:09-cv-00980-MHP) Declaration in Support filed by Michael J. Astrue; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/30/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
January 18, 2011 194 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER amending briefing schedules on first phase issues; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/18/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
November 16, 2010 191 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding discovery and further briefing schedules; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/16/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
October 23, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING HEARING DATE. Telephonic Conference re protective order set for 10/30/2009 at 3:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/23/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
September 10, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re discovery; The parties, with new counsel, are to meet and confer and draft a protective order for submission to this court; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/10/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
August 28, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER staying discovery to 1/8/2010 and amending further briefing schedules; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/28/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
September 4, 2008 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing briefing schedules: amended complaint to be filed by 11/10/2008; Motions for class certification to be filed by 11/18/2008; responsive pleading to be filed by 1/12/2009; Responses due by 1/12/2009; Replies due by 1/20/2009; Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/3/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Barnhart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?