Chambers et al v. City and County of San Francisco

Case Number: 3:2006cv06346
Filed: October 11, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 125 Letter filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/3/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
September 29, 2011 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CONTINUING REPORTING AND JURISDICTION re 123 Stipulation, filed by The Independent Living Resource Center of San Francisco, Woodrow Falls, Jr., Gerald Scott, Mark Chambers, Mary T., M.H., Phillip K. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
March 7, 2011 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION BY ATTORNEYS SONG, SU, MYERS, AND KRAMER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS by Judge Alsup granting 118 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Song; Henry C. Su; Robert F. Kramer and Gregg Aaron Myers terminated (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION CONCERNING THE END OF JURISDICTION IN THIS MATTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 7, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CMC. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 3, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
June 10, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court QUESTIONS FOR COUNSEL AT THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/10/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
November 21, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CLOSING FILE. PLEASE RESPOND BY NOON ON 12/1/2008. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/21/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
September 18, 2008 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re 91 Letter filed by The Independent Living Resource Center of San Francisco, Woodrow Falls, Jr., Gerald Scott, Mark Chambers, Mary T., M.H., City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/18/8. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
October 11, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 SCHEDULING ORDER-ADA (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers et al v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?