State of New York v. Micron Technology Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06436
Filed: October 16, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2010 221 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to permit New York to depose an Infineon witness pursuant to NY's 2009 Fed.R. Civ. P 30(b)(6) on or about 3/4/10 or 3/5/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/11/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 21, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to permit NY to depose an Infineon witness pursuant to NY's 2009 Fed R. Civ. P., 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition on or about Jan. 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/18/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
January 5, 2009 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 175 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and Granting Request to Re-Open Discovery. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 3, 2008 181 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDERCONTINUING THE DECEMBER 5, 2008 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE re 180 Stipulation, filed by Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Inc. Discovery Hearing continued to 1/9/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated jt discovery status conference statement due 1/5/9(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 17, 2008 179 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE and ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/17/2008. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 24, 2006 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2006 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/24/06. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York v. Micron Technology Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?