Bridgelux, Inc. v. Cree, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06495
Filed: October 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/7/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 5, 2008 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 113 Stipulation Postponing Further Case Management Conference filed by Bridgelux, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2009 02:30 PM. Joint CMC statement due 1/8/2009.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamiltion on 12/4/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
October 23, 2008 112 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER POSTPONING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 111 Stipulation filed by Bridgelux, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/23/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
September 12, 2008 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2008 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/12/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgelux, Inc. v. Cree, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?