Chavez v. Blue Sky Natural Beverage Co. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06609
Filed: October 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION (Dkt. No. 301). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/3/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 8, 2011 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 298 Stipulation To Continue Deadlines Set In Order Denying Motion for Sanctions filed by Chris Chavez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/8/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
October 24, 2011 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Stipulation 295 In Response to Order Denying Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. #292). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/24/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 21, 2011 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 294 Joint MOTION Establish Pretrial Schedule : Jury Trial set for 7/9/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 12, 2011 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMOVE AN INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT; (2) DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL; AND (3) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL (Dkts. Nos. 267, 268, 270). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/12/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
September 27, 2011 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; DENYING 165 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 166 Motion to Decertify; GRANTING 168 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; DENYING 169 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 195 Motion to Strike. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
June 15, 2011 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 276 Stipulation, filed by Blue Sky Natural Beverage Co., Hansen Natural Corp., Hansen Beverage Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/15/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 10, 2011 275 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Re Joint Statement on Status of Issues Ripe for Decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jaqueline Scott Corley on 6/10/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
April 14, 2011 265 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 264 Renotice motion hearing, filed by Chris Chavez, 258 Status Report filed by Chris Chavez Motion Hearing reset for 5/25/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/14/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
March 30, 2011 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/30/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
January 28, 2011 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Due to the pending retirement of the undersigned, the clerk is directed to re-assign this case. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/28/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 26, 2011 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Discovery Disputes 170 174 226 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/26/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
September 29, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re OSC hearing 152 Letter filed by Chris Chavez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/29/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 3, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 142 Parties' Joint Letter of August 27, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 25, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 136 Parties' Joint Letter of August 20, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 16, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 122 123 Letters of June 28 and July 7, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/16/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
July 16, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/16/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
June 18, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 82 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 84 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 94 Motion to Certify Class. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
September 23, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why plaintiff's motion to strike remaining affirmative defenses should not be granted; vacating 9/24/09 hearing. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/15/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 10/5/2009. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
August 24, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/21/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 20, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendants to produce documents not later than October 15, 2009. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Blue Sky Natural Beverage Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?