Burton et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06658
Filed: October 26, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Homer L. Peters and Virginia Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/5/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
June 17, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJDUICE re 10 Stipulation filed by Pfizer, Inc., James Irwin terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/5/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
October 30, 2006 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/30/2006. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2006)
October 26, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?