Marks v. Chicoine et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv06806
Filed: November 1, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
April 29, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's motion for entry of default judgment as to defendant Tom Chicoine is granted. In accordance with Rule 56(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, judgment in the amount of $25,000 is entered in favor of plaintiff and against defeneant Tom Chicoine. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 10, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's motion for entry of judgment as to defendant Tom Chicoine is granted. Judgement is the amount of $25,000 in entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendant Tom Chicoine. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
February 11, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Plaintiff's further documentation is due 2/27/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
September 16, 2008 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/15/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Chicoine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?