Bruckert v. City of Concord

Case Number: 3:2006cv06920
Filed: November 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice, filed by City of Concord. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/22/08. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 8, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/8/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 18, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/18/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruckert v. City of Concord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?