Khamenehpour et al v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Number: 3:2006cv07015
Filed: November 9, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment as unopposed; Action dismissed with prejudice (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
January 8, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Order, Set Hearings Settlement Conference set for 1/26/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/8/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
October 24, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge HON. MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/24/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khamenehpour et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?