The Thomas Kinkade Company et al v. Hazlewood et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07034
Filed: November 13, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 09:0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ASSIGNMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/7/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
December 27, 2012 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. Marilyn H. Patel no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/27/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
October 11, 2012 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 207 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Other) filed by Thomas Kinkade At The Downtown Mall LLC, Jeff Spinello (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Thomas Kinkade Company et al v. Hazlewood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?