Formfactor, Inc. v. Micronics Japan Co. Ltd. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07159
Filed: November 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 95 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 15, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 14, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 92 Stipulation Re Changes to Pre-Trial Dates Relating to an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/14/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
May 27, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 90 Stipulation (2nd) re Changes to Pre-Trial Dates Relating to an Amended Complaint. Motions due by 6/14/2010. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/27/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 4, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 87 STIPULATION RE CHANGES TO PRE-TRIAL DATES RELATING TO AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/4/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
February 22, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Parties to Meet and Confer and Submit Stipulation or Case Management Conference Statement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 22, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
April 3, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Further Joint Status Reports Status Report due by 4/10/2009 and every 120 days thereafter until the stay is lifted.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/3/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
February 1, 2008 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 42 MOTION to Stay VACATING Impending Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 1, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Formfactor, Inc. v. Micronics Japan Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?