Holliday v. General Electric Company et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07175
Filed: November 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Ray D. Holliday. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
July 9, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Remanding Case from Eastern District of PA. (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
November 20, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliday v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?