Allen et al v. Pfizer Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv07284
Filed: November 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Johnny Fields terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/10/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
May 19, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on May 19, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
April 12, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on April 9, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 6, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on April 6, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
December 11, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Vacating Dismissal with Prejudice. Case reopened. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 9, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/8/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
January 22, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL WITH PREJDUICE re (3 in 3:06-cv-07284-CRB) Stipulation,,,,,, filed by Pfizer Inc., Damas Alvarado; Grady L. Banks, Sr; Richard Barker; Bill Bennett; Antonio Bermea; Lucy Boyd; Samuel Lee Buffington; Lee A. Carr; Maria Irma Cavazos ; Brenda Chaisson; Wessie Cole; Ralph S. Collier; Archie Cornish; Roberto Cruz, Sr; Iris Kay Damron; Gertrude Davenport; Lee Dawson; Henry Diaz; Dollie Farris; Johnny Fields; Mike Flint; Robert Ford; Robyn Orene Glover; Casiano Gonzales; Manuel Gonza les; Roy Gonzalez; Selma L. Green; Beverly Ann Griffin; John Guidry; Bruce Hale; Cynthia L. Hewitt; Mary L. Hill; Mariea C. Hite; Mary Ann Holland; Ronald D. Hudson; Curitha Hunter; Cora Improte; Ellis Johnson; George O. Johnson; Mary Juarez; Dorothy Wilson Lee; Jose G. Lozano; Katherine Maher; Denna Dossey Maness; Kathryne Maxie; Kitty McGee; Maria Moreno; Cynthia Osborne; James W. Pair; Teofila Martinez Palomino; Dovie Pruitt; Betty Puckett; Luther Pullings; Ramon Ramos; Shirley Richard; Melvi n Rimmer; Herman Scott; Alejandro Sepulveda; Herbert George Shattuck; Dorothy Mae Shaw; Bernice Sterling; Tommy Hughes Taylor; William Teague; Roger Teich; Joseph Terebessy; Rickey Dwayne Thomas; Linda Thompson; Ina R. Tyler; Aurora Villareal; Ralph D. Wallace; Marian B. Williams; Raymond Wright and Margaret E. Allen terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Pfizer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?