Speedtrack, Inc. v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07336
Filed: November 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2012 388 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF AGREED UPON COSTS TO BE TAXED PURSUANT TO ENDECA TECHNOLOGY, INC.'S BILL OF COSTS re 385 Stipulation filed by Speedtrack, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/1/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
February 22, 2012 358 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting in Part and Denying in Part 322 324 Motions for Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 3, 2012 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 349 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and Vacating Hearing Date (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
November 18, 2011 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Further Briefing. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/18/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 15, 2011 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING USE OF EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM re 343 Proposed Order filed by Speedtrack, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/15/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
August 4, 2011 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE re 336 Stipulation filed by Endeca Technologies, Inc., Speedtrack, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/4/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
March 16, 2011 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STAY AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 315 Letter filed by Speedtrack, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
December 3, 2009 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 290 Motion to Enjoin and Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
July 1, 2009 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCES FOR WAL-MART.COM USA LLC re 284 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Endeca Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/1/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
February 5, 2009 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 266 Motion to Stay Pending Patent Reexamination and Terminating 219 Motion for Summary Judgment; 227 Motion for Summary Judgment; 237 Motion to Strike; 248 Motion to Seal; and 253 Motion to Strike (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 27, 2009 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF SPEEDTRACK, INC.'S REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE re 269 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Speedtrack, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/27/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 21, 2009 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING USE OF EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM re 265 Proposed Order filed by Speedtrack, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/21/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
November 18, 2008 225 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE: STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY. AS PARTIES AGREE, NO ORDER IS NECESSARY AND COURT DECLINES TO SIGN ORDER re 223 Stipulation filed by Endeca Technologies, Inc., Speedtrack, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/18/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
October 30, 2008 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 179 Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Defendants from Relying on Contentions Not Disclosed in Final Invalidity Contentions (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 22, 2008 202 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE FROM OCTOBER 17, 2008 TO DECEMBER 3, 2008 re 197 Stipulation filed by Speedtrack, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/22/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 15, 2008 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORY ANSWERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/15/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 29, 2008 187 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS PURSUANT TO COURT'S SEPTEMBER 12, 2008 ORDER re 186 Stipulation filed by Speedtrack, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/29/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 24, 2008 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 140 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 161 Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 12, 2008 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/12/2008. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 5, 2008 157 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/5/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speedtrack, Inc. v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?