Rearden LLC et al v. Rearden Commerce Inc

Case Number: 3:2006cv07367
Filed: November 30, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 324 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 323 Stipulation.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
April 1, 2013 322 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 321 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 8, 2013 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 8, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
November 14, 2012 313 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 312 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 18, 2012 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 309 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
August 17, 2012 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 300 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
July 12, 2012 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Hon. Marilyn H. Patel no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/12/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
September 1, 2010 291 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING COURT'S ORDER OF AUGUST 23, 2010, STAYING EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT AND APPROVING POSTING OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 08/31/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 24, 2010 288 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER staying execution of judgment for payment of costs upon posting of supersedeas bond; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/23/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 2, 2010 282 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/1/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 1, 2010 281 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is DENIED; Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
February 26, 2009 245 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 243 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
January 27, 2009 235 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re cross-motions for summary judgment, evidentiary motions, and motions to seal; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/23/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 14, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is DENIED.Plaintiffs' objections to evidence are SUSTAINED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as described above. Defendant's motions to strike are DENIED. Plaintiffs' and defendants motions to seal are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rearden LLC et al v. Rearden Commerce Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?