Applied Materials, Inc. v. MultiMetrixs, LLC

Case Number: 3:2006cv07372
Filed: December 1, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2010 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Attorney Judith L. Whitman for Mark Kesel,Judith L. Whitman for MultiMetrixs, LLC,Judith L. Whitman for MultiMetrixs, LLC added; Attorney Paul B. Arenas withdrawn; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/8/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 21, 2010 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE OF EXAMINATION FOR MARK KESEL re 177 Amended MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam EX PARTE MOTION filed by Applied Materials, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/21/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
May 26, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Plaintiff's motion for exceptional case finding and award of attorneys' fees is GRANTED as to Multimetrixs; it is DENIED without prejudice as to Kesel, Kesil and Gershenzon. Multimetrixs, L LC, shall pay to Applied Materials, Inc. as and for attorneys' fees and costs the amount of $1,427,926.94 within sixty (60) days of the filing of this order. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint or to initiate other proceedings in accordance with this order within sixty (60) days of the filing of this order if it appears that Multimetrixs will fail to pay any or all of the amount ordered. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Applied Materials, Inc. v. MultiMetrixs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?