MIPS Technologies , Inc v. Trident Microsystems, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv07377
Filed: December 1, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2007 37 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/5/2007. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 4, 2007 36 Featured Case ORDER FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/4/07. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 35 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL by MIPS Technologies, Inc, Trident Microsystems, Inc.. (Buna, Jarod) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 3, 2007 34 ***THIS ENTRY REMOVED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. SEE DOCKET # 36 . *** (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2007 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/5/2007 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2007 33 Featured Case NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
April 2, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
March 30, 2007 32 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes; referring 29 plaintiff's motion to extend time to object and respond to written discovery requests, and all further discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/30/2007. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 30, 2007 31 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by MIPS Technologies, Inc, Trident Microsystems, Inc.. (Buna, Jarod) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 29, 2007 30 Declaration of Kevin C. May in Support of 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Objections to Trident's Written Discovery Requests and [Proposed] Order filed byMIPS Technologies, Inc. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Buna, Jarod) (Filed on 3/29/2007)
March 29, 2007 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Objections to Trident's Written Discovery Requests and [Proposed] Order filed by MIPS Technologies, Inc. (Buna, Jarod) (Filed on 3/29/2007)
March 28, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 5/16/2007 09:30 AM., in the law offices of Shearman & Sterling, LLP, 1080 Marsh Road, Menlo Park, CA. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2007)
March 28, 2007 28 Letter to counsel dated 3/27/2007 from Mediator, Vicki Veenker. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2007)
March 19, 2007 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on Friday, March 23, 2007 at 11:30 a.m. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2007)
March 15, 2007 27 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/15/2007. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007)
March 14, 2007 26 Proposed Order [Stipulated/Protective] by MIPS Technologies, Inc, Trident Microsystems, Inc.. (Buna, Jarod) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 13, 2007 25 Letter dated 3/12/2007 to counsel from Mediator, Vicki Veenker. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
March 9, 2007 24 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/9/2007 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 3/9/2007). Proposed Pretrial Schedule due by 3/30/2007. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/15/2007 09:00 AM. (Not Reported.) (tl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2007)
March 6, 2007 23 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Vicki Veenker as Mediator dated 3/6/2007. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 1, 2007 22 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT , PROPOSED 26(F) REPORT AND PROPOSED ORDER filed by MIPS Technologies, Inc, Trident Microsystems, Inc.. (Buna, Jarod) (Filed on 3/1/2007)
February 16, 2007 21 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/16/2007. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 16, 2007 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by MIPS Technologies, Inc and Trident Microsystems, Inc. (Buna, Jarod) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 16, 2007 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Buna, Jarod) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 15, 2007 18 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFENDANT TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS, INC. byMIPS Technologies, Inc. (Buna, Jarod) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
February 14, 2007 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Trident Microsystems, Inc. (Lim, Sal) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 7, 2007 16 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of attorney Kevin C. May (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
February 5, 2007 15 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Kevin C. May to appear in Pro Hac Vice ; fee paid; receipt number 34611002588 filed by MIPS Technologies, Inc. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/5/2007)
January 22, 2007 14 Certificate of Interested Entities Defendant and Counterclaimant's F.R.C.P. 7.1 Disclosures (Goldman, William) (Filed on 1/22/2007)
January 22, 2007 13 Trident Microsystems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against MIPS Technologies, Inc byTrident Microsystems, Inc.. (Goldman, William) (Filed on 1/22/2007)
January 8, 2007 12 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to January 22, 2007 for defendant to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/8/2007. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 8, 2007 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Trident Microsystems, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Trident Microsystems, Inc.. (Goldman, William) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
December 22, 2006 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: That Case No. C-99-4766-SBA is NOT Related (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2006 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2006 9 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of attorney David A. Nelson (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 21, 2006 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MIPS Technologies, Inc. Trident Microsystems, Inc. served on 12/21/2006, answer due 1/10/2007. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/21/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2006 (aaa, Court Staff).
December 12, 2006 7 CLERK'S NOTICE to Plaintiff(s) Attorney(s) by e-mail or U.S. mail re: Failure to E-File/E-Mail re 1 Complaint, 4 Certificate of Interested Entities & 6 Notice of Related Case and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/12/2006)
December 1, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/1/2006)
December 1, 2006 Docket Number re 6 Notice of Related Case was erroneously e-filed Plaintiff(s) Attorney Mr. Buna was notified via telephone that an Administrative Motion to Relate Case should be filed in the lower case 99-4766 SBA in order for the Clerk to take action on the requested Motion. Judge Armstrong's Clerk notified via inter-office mail. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/1/2006)
December 1, 2006 6 NOTICE of Related Case: Member Case 99-4766 SBA by MIPS Technologies, Inc (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/1/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2006 (aaa, Court Staff).
December 1, 2006 5 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney David A. Nelson to appear in Pro Hac Vice; fee paid; receipt number 44611000018 filed by MIPS Technologies, Inc. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/1/2006)
December 1, 2006 4 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by MIPS Technologies, Inc (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/1/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2006 (aaa, Court Staff).
December 1, 2006 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:Patent and Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/1/2006)
December 1, 2006 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/2/2007. Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2007 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/01/07. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/1/2006)
December 1, 2006 Summons Issued as to Trident Microsystems, Inc.. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/1/2006)
December 1, 2006 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT AND TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND UNFAIR COMPETITION: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Trident Microsystems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 44611000018.). Filed byMIPS Technologies, Inc. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/1/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2006 (aaa, Court Staff).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIPS Technologies , Inc v. Trident Microsystems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?