United States Of America v. $43,029 in United States Currency et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07421
Filed: December 4, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2008 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Default Judgment Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/1/2008 Granting re 70 Motion for Default Judgment: Default Judgment be, and hereby is, entered for the United States against $43,029 in United States Currency & $9,641 in United States Currency. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
October 9, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/9/08. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
December 4, 2006 2 Opinion or Order of the Court Civil Standing Order. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2007 01:30 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. $43,029 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?