Valladon v. City of Oakland

Case Number: 3:2006cv07478
Filed: December 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2010 379 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting substitution (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
November 20, 2009 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pretrial set 3/16/10 and trial set 3/22/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 165 , 168 , 180 , 345 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
August 21, 2009 337 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 328 , 162 , 114 , 177 , 188 , 196 , 199 , 190 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
July 17, 2009 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SUBGROUP Q re 118 .(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 16, 2009 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE, GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT, and RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. 297 , 299 , 303 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 6, 2009 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating motion hearing and dismissl w/prejudice Subgroups H, I, J, K, L, & M (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 30, 2009 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: briefing schedule (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
April 24, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motions- Correct Version (trial date remains as previously scheduled). Signed by Judge Illston on 4/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 23, 2009 210 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK FILED THE WRONG ORDER... THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS FILED IN ERROR ORDER continuing motions #114, #118 and #120 to 5/22/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009) Modified on 4/23/2009 (ts, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY MOTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 7, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 152 .(ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 1, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND EXPERT DISCLOSURES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 16, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing 4/24/09 motions to 5/1/09.. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 5, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION OF JUDITH E. KRAMER re 133 , 136 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 17, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' SCHEDULING REQUEST (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
December 29, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY MOTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
November 12, 2008 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adjusting litigation schedule. (see order for changes). Signed by Judge Illston on 11/11/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 4, 2008 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: expert discovery re 103 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valladon v. City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?