Olson et al v. Beck et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07487
Filed: December 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2012 160 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING REVISED TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINE. Joint Updated Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/6/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
October 5, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion for Summary Judgment and Awarding Sanctions against Defendants (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
April 5, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/29/2011 09:30 AM. Show Cause Response from Defendants due by 4/15/2011; Plaintiff's reply by 4/22/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 04/05/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
November 16, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART STIPULATION REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice for Summary Judgment against Estate of Franz A. Beck, d eceased, Estate of Roberta Beck, Deceased, and Estate of Sandra Beck, Deceased re-set for 4/1/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 4/1/2011 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/15/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
August 30, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT RE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 30, 2010. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
July 26, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER as to 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice for Summary Judgment against Estate of Franz A. Beck, deceased, Estate of Roberta Beck, Deceased, and Estate of Sandra Beck, Deceased. Responses due by 8/20/2010. Replies due by 8/27/2010. Motion Hearing re-set for 9/24/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/23/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
June 18, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING re 121 Letter filed by 1990 Beck Family Trust for Continuance of the OSC and Motion for Summary Judgment hearing set for 6/18/10.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/17/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
May 6, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Reset hearing as to 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice for Summary Judgment against Estate of Franz A. Beck, deceased, Estate of Roberta Beck, Deceased, and Estat e of Sandra Beck, Deceased. Motion Hearing re-set for 6/18/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Order to Show Cause Hearing re-set for 6/18/2010 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/6/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
March 30, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/21/2010 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/29/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
January 22, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 1/22/10 at 1:30 PM has been re-set for 3/26/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
November 17, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/20/9 has been re-set for 1/22/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/16/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
September 14, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 9/18/9 at 1:30 PM has been re-set for 11/20/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/14/9. **PLEASE NOTE THE DATE CHANGE. DATE REQUESTED IN STIP DID NOT FALL ON A FRIDAY**(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
July 13, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 9/11/2009 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/13/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
March 2, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFEREMCE. Updated joint cmc statement due by 4/17/9. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 3/6/9 at 1:30 PM has been continued to 4/24/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/02/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
January 20, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JANUARY 23, 2009. The Further Case Management Conference has been continued to 3/6/2009 at 01:30 PM. A joint updated cmc statement shall be due by 2/27/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/20/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson et al v. Beck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?