Eliasoph v. LG Philips LCD Co., LTD. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07588
Filed: December 12, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to complaint and [proposed] order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 5/25/2011) (Entered: 05/25/2011) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
April 12, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING MARTIN QUINN AS SPECIAL MASTER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
October 20, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING UNITED STATES' OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S AUGUST 24, 2009 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
September 10, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AUOA'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RETURN OF INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
May 19, 2009 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AMNESTY APPLICATION DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH ACPERA (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
March 3, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
December 5, 2008 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING THE TOSHIBA ENTITIES' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 19, 2008 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING THE TOSHIBA ENTITIES' MOTION TO MODIFY MAY 27, 2008 ORDER AND STAY DISCOVERY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eliasoph v. LG Philips LCD Co., LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?