Lassetter et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07628
Filed: December 12, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Donna O'Brien, Alton Obert, Richard E. Rogers, Sarah Sankey, Lee Shafer, Charles Whitfield, Edwin H. Lassetter and Richard Linville terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/23/09. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 19, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Anita P. Mackey terminated.ned by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/13/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
September 30, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Anita P. Mackey. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/28/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lassetter et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?