Shen et al v. Lucy's Asia Bistro et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv07706
Filed: December 15, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER administratively closing case. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/17/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 14, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring statement by Plaintiffs re: 112 113 Notices of bankruptcy filed by Defendants Liao and Ting. Statement due on or before 08/19/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/14/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
July 10, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 103 Plaintiff's Request to Continue Ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 7/9/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shen et al v. Lucy's Asia Bistro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?