Leonardos v. Buddress

Case Number: 3:2006cv07769
Filed: December 19, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nickolas Leonardos. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 12, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 17, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 12 APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 17, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
October 9, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE-OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSED CASE AND LIFTING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/9/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonardos v. Buddress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?