Utica Mutual Insurance Company v. Hamilton Supply Company Incorporated

Case Number: 3:2006cv07846
Filed: December 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing dismissing Liberty and it's counter-claim (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
April 2, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO STAY CASE (5/8/09 case management conference remains on calendar). re 67 Signed by Judge Illston on 4/1/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
October 7, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adjusting trial schedule. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/3/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utica Mutual Insurance Company v. Hamilton Supply Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?