Office Depot, Inc. v. Zuccarini

Case Number: 3:2006mc80356
Filed: December 18, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2011 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant's requeste for emergency hearing (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
December 1, 2010 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDER RE: MOTIONS (Docs. 170, 173 175, 176, 185) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
September 27, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING AND REQUESTING A RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 13, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR FINDINGS OF CONTEMPT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AMENDED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE SALE OF DOMAIN NAMES AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DS HOLDINGS AND UNITED STATES TO RESPOND TO ZUCCARINI'S CONTENTIONS RE: CONFLICT OF INTEREST (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 4, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO AUTHORIZE SALE OF DOMAIN NAMES AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2010: # 1 Envelope) (tf, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY THE COURT'S JUNE 15, 2010 RULING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 16, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pro hac (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 15, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY RELIEF AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE NETWORK SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION TO INTERVENE(Docket No. 97, 105)(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 2, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADDING NEW PARTY (USA AS DEFT) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 12, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AUCTION OF DOMAIN NAMES AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ORDER RECEIVER TO PROVIDE MONTHLY REVENUE REPORTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 27, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Office Depot, Inc. v. Zuccarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?