USA v. Bonds Featured Case
Case Number: 3:2007cr00732
Filed: November 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Hon. Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2010 Filing 190 MOTION for Discovery Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Require Government to Provide Information by Barry Lamar Bonds. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 189 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion and Motion to Require Government to Provide Information by Barry Lamar Bonds. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 188 MOTION in Limine Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Conform Government's Evidence to this Court's February 19, 2009 Order by Barry Lamar Bonds. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 187 WITNESS LIST by Barry Lamar Bonds (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Swerdloff CV)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 186 EXHIBIT LIST by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 185 WITNESS LIST by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Parrella, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 184 TRIAL MEMORANDUM by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Parrella, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 183 Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Parrella, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 182 Proposed Form of Verdict by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Parrella, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 181 EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Parrella, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER excluding time as to Barry Lamar Bonds (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 179 Proposed Order by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds Excluding Time (Nedrow, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 178 AFFIDAVIT by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 177 Pretrial Order as to Barry Lamar Bonds (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 174 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 173 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Barry Lamar Bonds re 155 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 176 corrected minute with 3/1/11 pretrial date (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010) Modified on 8/11/2010 (rhw, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2010 Filing 175 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Trial Setting Hearing as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 8/6/2010 Jury Trial set for 3/21/2011 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2011 11:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2011 03:30 AM. (Court Reporter L. Zinn.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010) Modified on 8/11/2010 (rhw, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2010 Filing 172 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Attachments: # 1 Waiver, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER waiving appearance as to Barry Lamar Bonds (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 170 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Attachments: # 1 Waiver, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER excluding time as to Barry Lamar Bonds (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 168 Proposed Order by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds Excluding Time (Parrella, Matthew) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Status Conference as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 7/23/2010 Trial Setting Hearing set for 8/6/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Court Reporter L. Zinn.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 166 CLERKS NOTICE Trial Setting Hearing set for 7/23/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
June 18, 2010 Filing 165 USCA Opinion as to Barry Lamar Bonds re 155 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Transcript of Proceedings as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 02/27/09, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2009.(McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Certificate of Record as to Barry Lamar Bonds Mailed to US Court of Appeals re 155 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds for proceedings held on 11/05/08, 02/05/09, 02/17/09, 02/27/09 before Judge Susan Yvonne Illston, re Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA, 155 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory Transcript due by 4/22/2009. (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Transcript of Proceedings as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 02/17/2009, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number 415 531 6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2009.(Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Transcript of Proceedings as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 11/05/08, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2009.(jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Transcript of Proceedings as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 02/27/09, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2009.(McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 U.S. Marshals' return service as to Greg Anderson as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Letter from USCA re: appeal as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Order for Time Schedule as to Barry Lamar Bonds re 155 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds to US Court of Appeals re 155 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number as to Barry Lamar Bonds 09-10079 for 155 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by USA. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Docket Call as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 2/27/2009 (Court Reporter S. McVickar.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009) Modified on 3/5/2009 (rhw, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds re 137 Order on Motion in Limine. Filing fee : waived. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 CLERKS NOTICE YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the government has filed a notice of appeal. The jury selection will not proceed until further notice. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM Re: District Court's Discretion to Deny Stay of Proceedings Pending Government Appeal by Barry Lamar Bonds (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM On The Admissibility Of Greg Anderson's Refusal To Testify by Barry Lamar Bonds (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 The Associated Press, ESPN, Hearst Corporation, The New York Times Company, KNTV Television, Inc., and NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV), Inc., Los Angeles Times Communications, LLC's Ex parte application for order shortening time to hear motion to vacate order sealing completed juror questionnaires and for immediate and concurrent access to completed juror questionnaires; supporting memorandum of points and authorities; declaration of Duffy Carolan as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Filed by non-party The Associated Press, ESPN, Hearst Corp., The New York Times Co., KNTV Television Inc., NBC Subsidary KNBC-TV Inc., Los Angeles Times Communications, LLC, Medianews Group and Sports Illustrated: Errata to 154 ex parte application for order shortening time to hear motion to vacate order sealing completed juror questionnaires and for immediate and concurrent access to completed juror questionnaires, supporting memorandum of points and authorities, declaration of Duffy Carolan as to Barry Lamar Bonds (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (rhw, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Proposed Order by Barry Lamar Bonds to Bring into the Federal Courthouse Certain Equpment and Materials for Use During Trial (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER waiving appearance as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/25/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER as to Barry Lamar Bonds Docket Call Re: Greg Anderson set for 2/27/2009 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/25/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Sealed Document as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Proposed Order by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds UNITED STATES' REQUEST TO RE-SET HEARING AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CLERKS NOTICE ; continuing hearing re: Anderson to 2/27/09 @ 2 p.m. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Proposed Order by Barry Lamar Bonds Excusing Personal Appearance on 2 25 09 (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Transcript of Proceedings as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on February 5, 2009, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2009.(Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER directing Greg Anderson to appear on 2/25/09 @ 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/20/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Proposed Order by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Parrella, Matthew) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE (SI, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Jury Request Form (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Barry Lamar Bonds re 128 Response to Motion, Supplemental Memorandum Re Admissibility of Government's Proffered Expert Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Goodman & Gilman, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Dr. Ronald S. Swerdloff, MD, # 3 Exhibit C - Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Ronald S. Swerdloff, MD)(Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds FIRST AMENDED PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Pretrial Conference as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 2/17/2009 (Court Reporter L. Zinn.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009) Modified on 2/20/2009 (ts, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/20/2009 (rhw, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 TRIAL MEMORANDUM by Barry Lamar Bonds (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Verdict form, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Proposed Form of Verdict by Barry Lamar Bonds Proposed Verdict Form (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 WITNESS LIST by Barry Lamar Bonds Witness List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dr. Black's CV, # 2 Exhibit Dr. Swerdloff's CV)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds UNITED STATES SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSIBILITY OF EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY PROFFERED BY THE GOVERNMENT PURSUANT TO DAUBERT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Nedrow, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 EXHIBIT LIST by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Proposed Voir Dire by Barry Lamar Bonds Defendant's Proposed Additions To Juror Questionnaire (Anderson, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Proposed Voir Dire by Barry Lamar Bonds Joint Proposed Juror Questionnaire (Anderson, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE to Motion by Barry Lamar Bonds to United States' Supplemental Filing Re: Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 WITNESS LIST by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds UNITED STATES' WITNESS LIST (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 TRIAL MEMORANDUM by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Proposed Form of Verdict by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds UNITED STATES' PROPOSED FORM OF VERDICT (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Letter from Goverment RE: Governments Position on Jury Questionnaire in United States v. Bonds as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Nedrow, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Walter Anderson appearing for Barry Lamar Bonds (Anderson, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Letter from Defense Counsel Allen Ruby re media arrangements as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Letter from United States Attorney as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Parrella, Matthew) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER unselaing pleadings filed in CR-04-0044 SI as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/10/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Proposed Order re 112 Stipulation by Barry Lamar Bonds To Unseal Pleadings In Case CR 04-044 SI (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION To Unseal Pleadings In Case CR 04-044 SI by Barry Lamar Bonds (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER unsealing immunity order as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/9/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Motion Hearing as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 2/5/2009 (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009) Modified on 2/20/2009 (ts, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Proposed Order by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds UNSEALING APPLICATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Nedrow, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds UNITED STATES SUPPLEMENTAL FILING IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Nedrow, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James:Arraignment on 2nd superseding indictment as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1) Count 1ss-10ss,11ss held on 2/5/2009 ; not guilty plea entered. Trial Setting Hearing set for 2/5/2009 10:30 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. (Tape #9:39-9:41.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER UNSEALING DOCUMENTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 United States' motion for leave to file oversized brief and order as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/2/09. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Exhibits in support of defendant's reply to United States' opposition to motion in limine to exclude evidence by Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Defendant's reply to United States' opposition to motion in limine to exclude evidence as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (rhw, COURT STAFF). (rhw, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 United States' motion and order for sealing its opposition to defendant's motion in limine to exclude evidence as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (rhw, COURT STAFF). (rhw, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Exhibits to United States' opposition to defendant's motion in limine to exclude evidence as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (rhw, COURT STAFF). (rhw, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 United States' opposition to defendant's motion in limine to exclude evidence as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (rhw, COURT STAFF). (rhw, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE Manual Filing of Exhibits by Barry Lamar Bonds (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 95 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1). Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/3/09. (ts, COURT STAFF)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Barry Lamar Bonds (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant's Reply to United States' Opposition to Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence by Barry Lamar Bonds. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2009 10:30 AM. (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER RE: SEALING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Exhibits A, B, and C to defendant's motion in limine to exclude evidence as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (rhw, COURT STAFF). (rhw, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Seal as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1). Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 1/27/09. (ts, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Letter from M. PARRELLA, J. NEDROW, J. FINIGAN, D. WILSON to Honorable Susan Illston as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CLERKS NOTICE Continuance of Hearing Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2009 10:30 AM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1). Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 1/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Exclude Evidence by Barry Lamar Bonds. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2009 11:00 AM. (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE to Motion by Barry Lamar Bonds Defendant's Response to United States' Opposition to Motion to Seal (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL (Nedrow, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Motion in Limine by Barry Lamar Bonds. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Barry Lamar Bonds (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Barry Lamar Bonds. (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence by Barry Lamar Bonds. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Sealed Document as to Barry Lamar Bonds (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 12/15/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Pre-Trial Determination of Certain Evidentiary Issues by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 letter (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1) count(s) 1ss-10ss, 11ss. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 12/2/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR COUNSEL TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING A SCHEDULE FOR PRETRIAL HEARINGS by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Nedrow, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order DISMISSAL OF COUNTS as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1), Count(s) 2s, 8s, 14s dismissed
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER as to Barry Lamar Bonds STIPULATION and [Proposed Order} Extending time for Counsel to Meet & Confer and Submit Letter Briefs if Necessary, Regarding a Schedule for Pre-Trial Hearings by Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 11/21/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT (SI, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order} Extending time for Counsel to Meet & Confer and Submit Letter Briefs if Necessary, Regarding a Schedule for Pre-Trial Hearings by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston:Motion Hearing as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 11/5/2008. The Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts of the Superseding Indictment is taken under submission. (Court Reporter: Jim Yeomans) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 10/10/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Barry Lamar Bonds to Dismiss Counts I, II, V, VII, VIII, IX, XI, XII, XIV, and XV of the Superseding Indictment (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2008 04:30 PM. Status Conference set for 11/5/2008 04:00 PM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008) Modified on 9/30/2008 (ts, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds re 61 MOTION to Dismiss Superseding Indictment UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I, II, V, VII, VIII, IX, XI, XII, XIV, AND XV OF THE SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER continuing status conference to 10/24/08 @ 11 a.m. as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 8/27/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER VACATING AND RE-SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss Superseding Indictment by Barry Lamar Bonds. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2008 11:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Points and Authorities)(Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER waiving appearance as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 8/19/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Excusing Defendant's Personal Appearance)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Docket Call set for 10/24/2008 11:00 AM.
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER setting motions on 10/24/08 as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 7/8/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order 7/11/08 status vacated as to Barry Lamar Bonds: (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Pretrial ORDER as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 6/18/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 6/18/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER unsealing as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney on 6/10/08. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Trial Setting Hearing as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 6/6/2008 Docket Call set for 7/11/2008 11:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2009 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2009 03:30 PM. Status Conference set for 8/29/2008 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter C. Kuhl.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2008) Modified on 6/11/2008 (rhw, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman:Arraignment on superseding indictment as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1) Count 1s-14s,15s held on 6/6/2008 ; not guilty plea entered. (Tape #9:30-9:33.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Transcript of Proceedings as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 3/21/08, before Judge Illston. Court reporter: Kathy Wyatt.(lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Superseding INDICTMENT as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1) count(s) 1s-14s, 15s. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER excluding time as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 4/1/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
March 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Status Conference as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 3/21/2008 Status Conference set for 6/6/2008 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter K. Wyatt.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2008) Modified on 3/27/2008 (rhw, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Letter from MATTHEW A. PARRELLA, JEFFREY D. NEDROW, JEFFREY R. FINIGAN, J. DOUGLAS WILSON as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Nedrow, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 2/29/08 before Judge Susan Ilston. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER/waiver of appearance at 3/21/08 hearing as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 3/11/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER EXCLUDING TIME as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 3/4/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 3/4/08. (SI, COURT STAFF)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Motion Hearing as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 2/29/08;case continued to 3/21/08 @ 11 a.m. for further status (Court Reporter L. Zinn.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008) Modified on 3/6/2008 (rhw, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CORRECTED ORDER UNSEALING GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER unsealing grand jury transcrip as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 GJ Investigation No. 2002R01596 Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings Testimony of Barry Bonds, December 4, 2003 by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Document unsealed--refer to document #35
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Seal Document as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1). Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/22/08. (ts, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Barry Lamar Bonds Motion to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, To Strike Portions Of Indictment (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER waiving personal appearance as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/21/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Proposed MOTION to Seal Document UNITED STATES' MOTION TO SEAL GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT FILED WITH UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds. (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/19/2008)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE INDICTMENT (CORRECTED VERSION) (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE INDICTMENT (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER as to Barry Lamar Bonds Trial Setting Hearing set for 2/29/2008 11:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 2/6/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Barry Lamar Bonds
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Proposed Order re 22 Stipulation by Barry Lamar Bonds Vacating Status Conference (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION To Vacate Status Conference by Barry Lamar Bonds (Cassman, Ted) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, to Strike Portions of the Indictment by Barry Lamar Bonds. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2008 11:00 AM. (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Attorney update in case as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Attorney Jeffrey David Nedrow for USA added.
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF ADDITION OF COUNSEL by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Barry Lamar Bonds Declaration of Cristina C. Arguedas Concerning Inquiry into Potential Conflict of Interest (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Barry Lamar Bonds Declaration of Allen Ruby Concerning Inquiry into Potential Conflict of Interest (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Barry Lamar Bonds Declaration of Barry Lamar Bonds re Inquiry into Potential Conflict of Interest (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER by Barry Lamar Bonds (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Docket Call as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 12/21/2007 Status Conference set for 2/8/2008 11:00 AM. Defense counsel and the defendant shall file declarations regarding the waiver of conflict by January 4, 2008. The defendant was questioned as to his understanding of the conflict issues. Mr. Bonds indicated that he understood the issues and wished to proceed with his current attorneys. (Court Reporter J. Columbini.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Sealed Document as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Sealed Document as to Barry Lamar Bonds (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF UNITED STATES' MOTION TO HAVE COURT CONDUCT INQUIRY INTO POTENTIAL CONFLICT OF INTEREST (REDACTED VERSION) by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Attorney Conflict hearing...set for 12/21/2007 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2007)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Signed by Judge Hon. Susan Illston on 12/14/07. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Attorney update in case as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Attorney J. Douglas Wilson for USA added.
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Sealed Document as to Barry Lamar Bonds (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James:Initial Appearance as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 12/7/2007, Added attorney Allen Ruby for Barry Lamar Bonds, Cristina C. Arguedas, Michael L. Rains, Ted Cassman, Dennis Riordan, Donald M. Horgan for Barry Lamar Bonds. Douglas Wilson for USA. Arraignment as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1) Count 1-4,5 held on 12/7/2007 Plead not guilty. Set for 12/7/07 9:40 am before Judge Illston. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007) Modified on 12/10/2007 (lsk, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Attorney update in case as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Attorney Michael Logan Rains for Barry Lamar Bonds, Ted W. Cassman for Barry Lamar Bonds, Dennis Patrick Riordan for Barry Lamar Bonds, Donald M. Horgan for Barry Lamar Bonds added.
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Attorney update in case as to Barry Lamar Bonds. Attorney Michael Logan Rains for Barry Lamar Bonds added.
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:The defendants appearance maybe waive at the next appearance. The appropriate waivers shall be filed in advance of the next hearing.The government indicated that there may be a conflict issue with certain defense counsel. The government shall e.file a letter indicating the situation as they see it and the Court will determine if a hearing is necessary. If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, the defendant must be present.Defendant indicated that they may file a motion to dismiss the indictment.Trial Setting Hearing as to Barry Lamar Bonds held on 12/7/2007 Status Conference set for 2/7/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Trial Setting Hearing set for 12/7/2007 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Arraignment set for 12/7/2007 09:00 AM before Hon M. James. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Case as to Barry Lamar Bonds reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Judge William H. Alsup no longer assigned to the case.
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/26/07. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2007)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed on 11/19/07. as to Barry Lamar Bonds (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Related Case by USA as to Barry Lamar Bonds (Finigan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 INDICTMENT as to Barry Lamar Bonds (1) count(s) 1-4, 5. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2007 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing.
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Initial Appearance set for 12/7/2007 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Barry Lamar Bonds:

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?