bebe stores, inc. et al v. forever 21 Inc et al Featured Case

bebe alleges that forever 21 sold garments bearing designs that were identical or virtually identical to bebe\'s copyrighted designs.

Plaintiff: bebe studio, inc and Bebe Stores, Inc.
Defendant: forever 21 Retail Inc, forever 21 Logistics LLC, forever 21 Inc and forever XXI Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv00035
Filed: January 4, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2007 29 Opinion or Order of the Court
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. A Settlement Conference has been set for 11/29/2007, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom A. Settlement Conference Statements shall be LODGED with Chambers (NOT electronically filed) no later than 11/15/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/13/2007. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
July 3, 2007 28
CERTIFICATION OF ENE Session on 6/27/2007, case not settled, no follow up contemplated, ENE complete. Signed by Evaluator, Andrew P. Bridges, dated 7/3/2007. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
May 18, 2007 25
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byBebe Stores, Inc.. (McElenney, Sean) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
May 7, 2007 24 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall file 1st Amended Complaint by 5/18/07. Parties to meet and confer re: unfair competition preemption issue. Defendant shall file motion re: unfair competition by 6/8/07. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 5/7/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 4, 2007 23
STIPULATION by Bebe Stores, Inc.. (McElenney, Sean) (Filed on 5/4/2007)
May 3, 2007 22
NOTICE by Bebe Stores, Inc. of service of first request for production of documents and tangible things (McElenney, Sean) (Filed on 5/3/2007)
April 25, 2007 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (with counsel only) for 8/10/2007, at 1:30 p.m. Chambers staff will initiate the teleconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/25/2007. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 24, 2007 18
Minute Entry: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference was held on 4/23/2007. A Further Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held on 8/10/2007, at 1:30 p.m. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2007)
April 20, 2007 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 4/23/2007, at 1:30 p.m. Chambers staff will initiate the teleconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/20/2007. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2007)
April 18, 2007 16
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Andrew P. Bridges as ENE Evaluator dated 4/18/2007. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 12, 2007 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 04/12/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2007)
April 11, 2007 14
Minute Entry: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/10/2007 before Judge Martin J. Jenkins. The parties are directed to meet and confer by 5/4/07 re: the preemption issue and file indication of agreement or motion by close of business that date. Further Status Conference set for 12/11/2007 02:00 PM. Discovery due by 3/28/2008. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2008 09:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2008 03:30 PM. 10 day Jury Trial set for 9/8/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. before Hon. Martin J. Jenkins. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement Conference by July 2008.(Court Reporter : Not Reported.) (epb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/11/2007)
April 4, 2007 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER selecting ADR process. Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 04/04/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 3, 2007 11
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by forever 21 Inc. (Blaxter, J.T.) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
April 2, 2007 9
MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Bebe Stores, Inc., bebe studio, inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (McElenney, Sean) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
March 21, 2007 8
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options Submitted by Defendants (Blaxter, J.T.) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
January 12, 2007 3
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: bebe stores, inc. et al v. forever 21 Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: forever 21 Retail Inc
Represented By: Paul Lewis Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: forever 21 Logistics LLC
Represented By: Paul Lewis Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: forever 21 Inc
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: forever XXI Inc
Represented By: Paul Lewis Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: bebe studio, inc
Represented By: George Chun Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bebe Stores, Inc.
Represented By: George Chun Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?