Peoples v. County of Contra Costa et al

Plaintiff: Bernice Peoples
Defendant: County of Contra Costa, Gus S. Kramer and Lori Koch
Case Number: 3:2007cv00051
Filed: January 4, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2009 270 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; Each side to bear costs; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/15/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
March 10, 2009 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Continuance of Briefing Schedule For Post-Trial Motions re 266 Stipulation, filed by County of Contra Costa, Lori Koch, Bernice Peoples, Gus S. Kramer. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/9/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
January 6, 2009 207 Opinion or Order of the Court EQUIPMENT ORDER re 193 ; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/5/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 5, 2009 201 Opinion or Order of the Court EQUIPMENT ORDER re 195 ; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/5/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
September 17, 2008 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER permitting 3rd party discovery; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/16/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 12, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING Further Settlement Conference for 10/1/2008 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/11/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 9, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending filing date to 9/12/2008 of trial exhibit lists and designations of Mr. Busenius' deposition transcripts; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/9/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
February 1, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to complete deposition of Paul Choroski to 2/28/2008; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/31/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples v. County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Represented By: Damali A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus S. Kramer
Represented By: Damali A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Koch
Represented By: Damali A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Peoples
Represented By: Pamela Yvette Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?