Hicks v. Johanns

Plaintiff: Amahra Hicks
Defendant: Mike Johanns
Case Number: 3:2007cv00112
Filed: January 8, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
January 12, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT FOR COMPROMISE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
November 18, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Hicks v. Schafer, 07-0112 MMC, is related to Hicks v. Schafer, 08-4960 CRB. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 5, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of the Action, it is ordered that plaintiff's claims be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, this order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 5, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 29, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO ENLARGE DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE. The deadline to file dispositive motions is continued to November 26, 2008, not November 28, 2008 at the parties had requested. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 3, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Johanns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amahra Hicks
Represented By: Lewis Nathaniel Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Johanns
Represented By: Katherine Burke Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?