Pokorny et al v. Quixtar Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jeff Pokorny and Larry Blenn
Defendant: Quixtar Inc, James Ron Puryear, Jr., Georgia Lee Puryear, World Wide Group LLC, Britt Worldwide LLC, American Multimedia Inc, Britt Management Inc, Bill Britt and Peggy Britt
Counter-claimant: Quixtar Inc
Counter-defendant: Jeff Pokorny and Larry Blenn
Case Number: 3:2007cv00201
Filed: January 10, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2015 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 349 claims administrator's denial of BSM claimants Deisy Lopez Medina and Raj Bodepudi's requests for review. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on February 12, 2015. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015).
December 15, 2014 348 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti adopting Report and Recommendations 345 , overruling objection 346 , and denying Sean Felder's request for additional compensation. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
November 24, 2014 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 342 Motion for Release of Funds. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014).
June 12, 2014 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Claimant Claude Zamor. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on June 12, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 9, 2014 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Second Submission of Objections to Hardship Awards. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on June 9, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
April 1, 2014 335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 305 Plaintiffs' Submission of rejected claim review requests. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on April 1, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 21, 2014 332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: status conference on denied hardship claims. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on March 21, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 12, 2014 331 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 328 Stipulation.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
January 8, 2014 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 320 USCA Order, GRANTING motion to reopen time. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on January 8, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 3, 2014 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Hardship Claims. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on January 3, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
August 26, 2013 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving Special Master's Recommendation on Payments to Original BSM Claimants. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on August 26, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
July 18, 2013 291 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 225 Motion for Attorney Fees.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 3, 2013 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Confirmation of Class Counsel's 225 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Compensation. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on July 3, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 2, 2013 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 277 Motion Retraction of Class Action Exclusion and Reinstatement of Class Action Participant Status (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 28, 2013 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Product Bundle Substitutions, Directing Commencement of Product Distributions, and Directing Notice to Rejected Claimants. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/27/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
May 29, 2013 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING Special Master's Fee Proposal. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/29/2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
April 17, 2013 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Verification of Certain BSM Claims and Additional Notice. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/17/2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
March 26, 2013 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting a Summary of Distribution of Excess and Equitable Distribution of Settlement Proceeds. Report due two weeks from the Order's signature date. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on March 26, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 12, 2013 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving and Adopting Special Master's Interim Fee Arrangement, per the letter of March 5, 2013. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on March 12, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
January 31, 2013 259 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti entering 256 Consent Judgment under Rule 54(b) and Dismissal of All Claims with Prejudice.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
December 27, 2012 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Special Master. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/27/2012. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
July 20, 2012 232 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 228 Motion for Approval of Reminder Notice. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
February 21, 2012 216 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 162 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
October 13, 2011 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/12/11. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 8, 2011 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting application of Joshua Riley to withdraw as counsel of record for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/8/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
July 20, 2011 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 162 Joint MOTION for Settlement filed by Kenneth Busiere, Jeff Pokorny, Larry Blenn. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/20/2011. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
March 10, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 159 Stipulation, filed by Quixtar Inc (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
November 18, 2010 153 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Vacating the November 22, 2010 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/18/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
June 21, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to September 17, 2010. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/21/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
January 18, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Willie E. Gary filed by Jeff Pokorny,, Larry Blenn,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/18/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pokorny et al v. Quixtar Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Pokorny
Represented By: Maria Patricia Sperando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Blenn
Represented By: Maria Patricia Sperando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quixtar Inc
Represented By: William Lewis Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ron Puryear, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Matthew Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Lee Puryear
Represented By: Charles Matthew Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Wide Group LLC
Represented By: Edward F. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britt Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Kneeland Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Multimedia Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Kneeland Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britt Management Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Kneeland Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Britt
Represented By: Benjamin Kneeland Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Britt
Represented By: Benjamin Kneeland Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Quixtar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Jeff Pokorny
Represented By: Gera Ruben Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Larry Blenn
Represented By: Gera Ruben Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?