Nawi v. Evans

Petitioner: Robert C. Nawi
Respondent: Evans
Case Number: 3:2007cv00261
Filed: January 16, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
March 28, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NOTICE OF INTENTION NOT TO FILE MOTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTIONS FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND DISCOVERY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
December 20, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND DENYING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 1, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 21, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE HABEAS PETITION AS UNTIMELY AND UNEXHAUSTED re [ 24 . Respondent's answer is due 11/20/09. Petitiner may file his traverse no later than 12/18/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
May 13, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request for extension re 22 . (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
March 20, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REOPEN ACTION, TO LIFT STAY AND FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PETITION re 20 . The Clerk shall serve by certified mail a copy of this order, the amended petition and all attachmetns thereto upon respondent and respon dent's attorney, the Attorney General of the State of California. The Clerk shall also serve a copy of this order on petitioenr and petitioner's counsel at the mailing address provided. Respondent's answer is due 4/24/09. Petitioner's optional traverse is due 5/29/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nawi v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert C. Nawi
Represented By: Michael N. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Evans
Represented By: Joan Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?