Jacobs v. CSAA Inter Insurance Bureau

Plaintiff: Alexander Jacobs
Defendant: CSAA Inter Insurance Bureau
Case Number: 3:2007cv00362
Filed: January 18, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for an award of attorneyss fees and costs is GRANTED for a total amount of $258,150.22, representing $255,000 in attorneys' fees and $3,150.22 in costs. Named plaintiff Alexander Jacobs is awarded an incentive payment of $7,5000; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/26/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 14, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT DISMISSING ACTION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/14/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
June 15, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting stipulation 69 continuing schedule for approval class action settlement; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/12/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
May 1, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: The joint stipulated motion for a preliminary injunction against federal class members from communication with or participation in the state court proceedings is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/30/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
March 25, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Final Approval Hearing set for 5/4/2009 02:00 PM before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/24/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
November 26, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 CONTINUING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING for 2/5/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/26/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. CSAA Inter Insurance Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA Inter Insurance Bureau
Represented By: Tonya Marie Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Jacobs
Represented By: Alan Dale Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?