Adobe Systems Incorporated v. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv00385
Filed: January 19, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2008 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 118 Stipulation Protective Order re Depositions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/6/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 4, 2008 117 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/4/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
February 1, 2008 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 114 and 115 Letters REFERRING All Discovery to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 1, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Martin Howard Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?