Rosenbaum Capital, LLC v. McNulty et al

Plaintiff: Rosenbaum Capital, LLC and T. Paul Thomas
Defendant: Secure Computing Corporation, John E. McNulty and Tim Steinkopf
Case Number: 3:2007cv00392
Filed: January 19, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING AND APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/08/09. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
January 7, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding briefing schedule for preliminary approval of settlement. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/6/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 2, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re briefing schedule for the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and setting the hearing for Preliminary Approval of Settlement on February 6, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/2/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
September 5, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/5/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenbaum Capital, LLC v. McNulty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secure Computing Corporation
Represented By: Carol Lynn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. McNulty
Represented By: Michael L. Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Steinkopf
Represented By: Carol Lynn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosenbaum Capital, LLC
Represented By: Marc S. Henzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Paul Thomas
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?