Garcia v. Soule et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Robert Garcia
Defendant: M. Jones, D. Kays, H. Soule and D. Higgerson
Case Number: 3:2007cv00438
Filed: January 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of D. Higgerson, D. Kays, H. Soule, M. Jones against Johnny Robert Garcia. 1. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is hereby DENIED.2. Defendants motion to file a brief in excess of twenty-five pages is hereby GRANTED.3. Defendants motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED, and judgment shall be entered in favor of each of the defendants.4. Plaintiffs motions to compel discovery are hereby DENIED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING 64 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 45 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMBINED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 8, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 32 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 29, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION; DENYING 26 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COURT TO RENDER DECISION IN CASE NUMBER C 06-6735. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 10, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/22/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Soule et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Kays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Higgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Robert Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?