Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. F&M Engineering Contractors, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Training Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Cletus Marion McConville
Case Number: 3:2007cv00486
Filed: January 24, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:185 Employee Pension Plan
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/25/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 6, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 40 Joint Case Management Statement, filed by Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for No rthern California, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Training Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 6, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 3, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING Further Case Management Conference to 10/10/2008 11:00 AM re 38 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/3/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
February 6, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (30 in 3:07-cv-00487-EDL) Proposed Order, filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust F und for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 6, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. F&M Engineering Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cletus Marion McConville
Represented By: Judith L. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Training Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Joye Blanscett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Joye Blanscett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?