Flores v. Zale Delaware, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jackie Flores
Defendant: Zale Delaware, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00539
Filed: January 25, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 87 June 23, 2010 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/22/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
June 23, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 85 Plaintiffs' motion to enforce final order. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 07/19/10 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 07/02/10. Opposition to Plaintiffs' motion due by 06/25/10. Reply due by 07/02/10. Hearing continued to 07/19/10 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/23/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
January 12, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 66 Motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 2, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: extension of deadline to file preliminary approval motion. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/01/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
February 8, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline to file class certification motion to 07/25/08. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/08/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Zale Delaware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zale Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory William Knopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Flores
Represented By: Elizabeth Aida Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?