Medtronic, Inc. et al v. AGA Medical Corporation

Plaintiff: Medtronic Vascular, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic USA, Inc.
Defendant: AGA Medical Corporation
Counter-claimant: AGA Medical Corporation
Counter-defendant: Medtronic Vascular, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00567
Filed: January 29, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2010 1102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 23, 2010 1099 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Brian McMahon is permitted to withdraw as counsel for AGA Medical Corporation. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
February 2, 2010 1097 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE REQUEST TO SET HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR REMITTITUR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 2, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 5, 2010 1085 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AGA'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL AGA'S OPPOSITION TO MEDTRONIC'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 4, 2010 1083 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S NOVEMBER 23, 2009 ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 4, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 4, 2009 1055 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 1053 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM DURING TRIAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
November 20, 2009 1022 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MEDTRONIC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST AGA'S EQUITABLE-ESTOPPEL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE AND COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 19, 2009 1020 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 1019 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO THE U.S. COURTHOUSE FOR USE AT THE HEARING ON NOVEMBER 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 19, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 2, 2009 1016 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RE: JOINT REQUEST FOR FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference is now set for November 12, 2009 at 2:00 p.m., with all counsel to appear by telephone. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 14, 2009 1012 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 1007 MEDTRONIC'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FROM THE COURT'S PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER DEADLINE TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION; SETTING HEARING DATE ON MEDTRONIC'S OUTSTANDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. At Medtr onic's request, Medtronic's motions for summary judgment on the issues of equitable estoppel and inequitable conduct are set for hearing on November 20, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 14, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 6, 2009 1008 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. SPERO FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
August 11, 2009 996 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MEDTRONIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
July 31, 2009 951 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MEDTRONIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 31, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 20, 2009 888 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Miranda M. Olvera is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 15, 2009 862 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MEDTRONIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 15, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 13, 2009 843 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MEDTRONIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 13, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 10, 2009 817 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AGA'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE #1 UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 7, 2009 787 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AGA'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
July 6, 2009 782 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Kirk T. Bradley is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 757 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO THE U.S. COURTHOUSE FOR USE AT TRIAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 30, 2009 739 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MEDTRONIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Medtronic shall file in the public record, no later than July 2, 2009, Exhibit 1 to the Sinclair Declaration and a redacted version of the Sinclair Declaration, redacting only the material found to be sealable. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 30, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 18, 2009 665 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AGA'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 16, 2009 611 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MEDTRONIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF MEDTRONIC'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 11, 2009 591 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AGA'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
May 21, 2009 497 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AGA'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 21, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 8, 2009 487 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MEDTRONIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Medtronic's expert report on the issue of OTDP shall be served no later than May 11, 2009, and Medtronic shall make its expert available for deposition, limited to the issues raised in such report, no later than May 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 5, 2009 484 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/1/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 28, 2009 478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MEDTRONIC'S (1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST AGA'S EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE/COUNTERCLAIM AND (2) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 21, 2009 472 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. AGA's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims shall be filed no later than May 1, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 21, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
March 31, 2009 466 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING APRIL 3, 2009 HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 26, 2009 463 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AGA'S REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 24, 2009 421 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AGA'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 24, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 23, 2009 419 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MEDTRONIC'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO MEDTRONIC; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 23, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 19, 2009 384 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MEDTRONIC'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO MEDTRONIC; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 13, 2009 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MEDTRONIC'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO MEDTRONIC; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. If Medtronic wishes the Court to consider any document not found to be sealable, Medtronic shall file such document in the public record no later than March 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 13, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 4, 2009 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF KAREN D. MCDANIEL FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 2, 2009 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 238 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Opening Expert Reports. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 18, 2009 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 17, 2009 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AGA'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS ANSWER UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 17, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 9, 2009 256 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 240 Stipulation, filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic Vascular, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/9/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 6, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE EDWARD M. CHEN. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 3, 2009 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MEDTRONIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 29, 2009 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. AGA shall file in the public record, no later than February 5, 2009, redacted versions of the Motion for Leave and the Hemminger declara tion, redacting only the above-referenced portions thereof. If AGA wishes the Court to consider Exhibit A to the Hemminger declaration, AGA shall file such exhibit, no later than February 5, 2009, in the public record. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 23, 2009 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE. Medtronic's opposition to the Motion for Leave shall be filed no later than January 30, 2009. AGA's reply shall be filed no later than February 6, 2009. The hearing on the Motion for Leave shall be on February 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 17, 2008 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER. Defendant shall file its Amended Answer no later than January 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 17, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
November 21, 2008 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 21, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 18, 2008 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen conditionally granting 125 Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of Confidentiality (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 17, 2008 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION REQUESTING SPECIAL STATUS CONFERENCE TO REQUEST TWO WEEK EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE FACT DEPOSITIONS AND EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 14, 2008 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHEN. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
September 22, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 8, 2008 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
February 6, 2008 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medtronic, Inc. et al v. AGA Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medtronic Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Wai Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Wai Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Wai Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGA Medical Corporation
Represented By: Young J. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: AGA Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Medtronic Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Wai Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Wai Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Wai Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?