Bratton et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Swartz, Evan Reynolds, Marsha Bratton, Arthur Ehlers and Chlorene Mayer
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., Deb Bosak and Holly Oswald
Case Number: 3:2007cv00601
Filed: January 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/19/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
May 20, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 11 Stipulation filed by Pfizer Inc., Evan Reynolds terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/19/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 11, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Ronald Swartz terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/30/09. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 5, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Arthur Ehlers terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/30/09. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratton et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Swartz
Represented By: Bradley Honnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Reynolds
Represented By: Brian Stanley Riepen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Bratton
Represented By: Brian Stanley Riepen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Ehlers
Represented By: Brian Stanley Riepen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chlorene Mayer
Represented By: Brian Stanley Riepen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Bosak
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Oswald
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?